Mak, Susanna So Sum (CPSO#: 63875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 18-365
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5554
Fax: (416) 586-4775
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mak and Walk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Walk ( CPSO# 63895 )
Dr. S. Mak ( CPSO# 63875 )

Business Address:
Suite 410
1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 624-1597

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 18-365
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSANNA SO SUM MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1992