Makan, Gopal (CPSO#: 27016)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Natal, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gopal Makan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 14 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital 381 Church Street Markham, ON L3P 7P3
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016