Makanjee, Bhavanesh (CPSO#: 88173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Makanjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Makanjee ( CPSO# 88173 )

Business Address:
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 281-9499

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Cardiology
235 Salem Road
Suite E-5
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 426-8333

Business Address:
Rouge Valley - Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Rouge Valley - Ajax and Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 19 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BHAVANESH MAKANJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKANJEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Mar 2008 to 28 May 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 29 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 09 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009