Makar Abdel Messih, Inas Helmy (CPSO#: 69288)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Jul 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street N6A 4V2
London ontario
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 685-8281
Fax: (519) 646-6149
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Makar Abdel Messih Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Makar Abdel Messih ( CPSO# 69288 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
The Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 685-8281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 09 Jul 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Inas Helmy Makar Abdel Messih may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Ophthalmology,  University  of  Western Ontario, in which Dr. Makar
                        Abdel Messih holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically  expires  when  Dr.  Makar
                  Abdel Messih no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.