Makar, Magdy Samir Isaac (CPSO#: 69540)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
47 West Street South
Orillia ON  L3V 5G2
Phone: (705) 325-1944
Fax: (705) 325-7508
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: (705) 325-4583
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Magdy S. Makar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Makar ( CPSO# 69540 )

Business Address:
47 West Street South
Orillia ON  L3V 5G2
Phone Number: (705) 325-1944

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2A3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGDY SAMIR ISAAC MAKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1998