Makarewicz, Pawel Antoni (CPSO#: 53393)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2004