Makerewich, Leonard Alexander (CPSO#: 29772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Optimist Square
4725 Dorchester Road
Unit B15
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 0A8
Phone: (905) 374-2451
Fax: (905) 374-9267
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Makerewich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Makerewich ( CPSO# 29772 )

Business Address:
Unit B15
Optimist Square
4725 Dorchester Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 0A8
Phone Number: (905) 374-2451

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEONARD ALEXANDER MAKEREWICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKEREWICH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 12 Feb 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Dec 2012
Summary:

On December 12, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Makerewich committed an act 
of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
suitability to practice; and in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Makerewich admitted to the allegations.  
 
Dr. Makerewich s practice of billing for a special surgical consultation (A935A) was 
inappropriate as Dr. Makerewich did not himself personally spend the 50 minutes of time with 
the patient as required by the Schedule of Benefits but, instead, delegated part of this time to a 
non-physician staff member, who was a PhD and knowledgeable and experienced in sleep 
medicine. 
 
On December 17, 2010, Dr. Makerewich was found guilty of knowingly receiving payment 
between January 16, 2006 and December 1, 2008 for insured services that he was not entitled to 
receive, thereby committing an offence pursuant to s. 44 of the Health Insurance Act. He 
admitted that he billed OHIP and was paid, in respect of seven patient visits for two different 
patients which did not meet the requirements in the Schedule of Benefits because in each 
instance he did not have a direct physical encounter with the patient or perform a physical 
examination. These patients were seen by the same non-physician staff member. 
 
Dr. Makerewich advised the court that, shortly after the charges to which he plead guilty were 
laid [in June 2009], he substantially modified his practice and billing practices to ensure that they 
conformed with billing requirements and that he ceased billing service code A935A for patients 
jointly seen with his staff member. In fact, this was not correct, as he continued this practice until 
May 27, 2010. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered a public reprimand, a two-month suspension of Dr. 
Makerewich s certificate of registration, and directed the Registrar impose the following term, 
condition and limitation on Dr. Makerewich s certificate of registration: 
 
 
            Dr. Makerewich must successfully complete, at his own expense, 
            College-facilitated instruction in Ethics within one year from the date of this 
            Order. 
 
Dr. Makerewich was further ordered to pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 12, 2012