Maki Jr., Anton (CPSO#: 52384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hungarian

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 W Ravine Rd
Kingsport TN  37660
United States
Phone: (423) 967-6275

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - Florida
USA - Georgia
USA - Kentucky
USA - Michigan
USA - Tennessee
USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 11 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTON MAKI JR. may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKI JR. is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983