Makikallio-Anttila, Kaarin Esteri (CPSO#: 96810)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Oulu, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2011 to 24 Nov 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2011 to 16 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2012