Makin, Gordon James Vance (CPSO#: 33082)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Aug 1997