Makitie, Antti Aarni (CPSO#: 76315)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Helsinki, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 10 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 2003