Makki, Mehdi (CPSO#: 93825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:St.Christopher Iba Mar Diop Col of Med, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RVHS Rouge Valley Centenary
Department of Internal Medicine
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Makki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Makki ( CPSO# 93825 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Mehdi Makki may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine, only.