Makowka, Leonard (CPSO#: 51150)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Nov 1998