Maksymec, Marta Sophia (CPSO#: 59853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Frontenac Medical Associates
Suite 201
791 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone: (613) 544-2727
Fax: (613) 544-7247
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTA SOPHIA MAKSYMEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKSYMEC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1989