Malach, Jessica Hannah (CPSO#: 97553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Village Park Paediatrics
405-27 Roncesvalles Ave
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: 416-516-4111
Fax: 416-516-1104
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jessica Malach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Malach ( CPSO# 97553 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
405 - 27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 516-4111

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
9401 Jane Street
Suite 211
Maple ON  L6A 4H7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA HANNAH MALACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALACH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016