Malaiyandi, Viba Bhuvana (CPSO#: 93356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peninsula Dermatology
555 Prince Charles Drive N
Suite 102
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone: 905-732-4224
Fax: 905-227-9889
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Viba Malaiyandi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Malaiyandi ( CPSO# 93356 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland ON  L3B 6B5
Phone Number: (905) 732-4224

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIBA BHUVANA MALAIYANDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAIYANDI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015