Malamed, Rebecca Anne (CPSO#: 59743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Names: Malamed, Rebecca Margaret (used until: 20 Jun 2012 )     Rotenberg, Rebecca Margaret (used until: 11 Jun 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA ANNE MALAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAMED is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1989