Malat, Jan (CPSO#: 67932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and Mental
Health
Suite 321
60 White Squirrel Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 36669
Fax: (416) 583-1219
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mt Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
9 South
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jan Malat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Malat ( CPSO# 67932 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Suite E1 - 218
60 White Squirrel Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Mt Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
9 South
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAN MALAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999