Malavade, Tushar Suryakant (CPSO#: 96292)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Mumbai, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
427-600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-5133
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TUSHAR SURYAKANT MALAVADE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MALAVADE is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. MALAVADE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MALAVADE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MALAVADE shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MALAVADE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MALAVADE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018