Malavazzi, Marcella Marino (CPSO#: 91516)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Faculdade de Ciencias Medicas de Santos, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2009 to 15 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010