Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Malaviarachchi, Pushpa Kumara (CPSO#: 65642)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Ceylon, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 May 2006