Malayil, Nina Bridgit (CPSO#: 66403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto West Medical
Suite 1
523 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M8Y 1J7
Phone: (416) 760-8367
Fax: (416) 760-7212
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hassle Free Clinic
66 Gerrard Street East
Second Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1G3
Canada
Phone: 416-922-0566
Fax: 416-922-2018
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NINA BRIDGIT MALAYIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAYIL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995