Malcolm, Barry William (CPSO#: 24788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holland Orthopaedic and
Arthritic Centre
Suite 317
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone: (416) 967-8783
Fax: (416) 967-8785
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6775
Fax: (416) 480-5990
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry W. Malcolm Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Malcolm ( CPSO# 24788 )

Business Address:
MG 315 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6775

Business Address:
Holland Orthopaedic & Athritic Centre
Suite 317
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 967-8783

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY WILLIAM MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1972