Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Malcolm, Jacqueline Irene (CPSO#: 57217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
10 Alcorn Avenue
Toronto ON  M4V 3A9
Phone: (416) 927-7603
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE IRENE MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1988