Malcolm, Janine Charisse (CPSO#: 71201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
4th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81945
Fax: (613) 738-8261
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: (613) 721-4787
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Malcolm Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Malcolm ( CPSO# 71201 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
4-04 - 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 24 Jan 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANINE CHARISSE MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 24 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2002