Malcolm, Jennifer Pettigrew (CPSO#: 72202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: Pettigrew, Jennifer (used until: 24 Jan 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
High Park Health Centre
507-2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A6
Phone: (416) 766-2718
Fax: (416) 766-0196
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER PETTIGREW MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000