Malcolm, William Neil (CPSO#: 51153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
St Catharines Site - ICU
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (289) 219-1497
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Malcolm Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Malcolm ( CPSO# 51153 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St Catharines Site - ICU
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (289) 219-1497

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (289) 219-1497

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM NEIL MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1981 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2007