Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Malcolmson, Samuel Alexander (CPSO#: 19513)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 11 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Malcolmson Tel: (416) 488-8292 Fax: (416) 413-0016
Date Received: 08 Jun 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 11 Jun 2009

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Jun 2009
Summary:

 On June 11, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Malcolmson had committed acts of 
 professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient; and in that he had 
 engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.

Dr. Malcolmson was Patient A's psychiatrist from 2001 to 2003. Beginning in 
 approximately 2001, Dr. Malcolmson engaged in a variety of sexual acts with Patient A, including 
 intercourse; gave Patient A gifts and money; and travelled with Patient A. The sexual acts 
 occurred in Dr. Malcolmson's office, among other places.

The Discipline Committee ordered and 
 directed that:

1.	The Registrar revoke Dr. Malcolmson's certificate of registration 
 immediately.
2.	Dr. Malcolmson appear before the panel to be reprimanded.   
3.	Dr. Malcolmson pay 
 costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.  
4.	The results of this proceeding be included in 
 the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 11, 2009