Maldonado Ficco, Hernan (CPSO#: 102151)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Cordoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2013 to 11 Dec 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 12 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2014