Male, Roy Allen (CPSO#: 62289)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
465 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2B2
Phone: (416) 203-4507
Fax: (416) 364-0822
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROY ALLEN MALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1992