Malec, Carolyn Leslie (CPSO#: 72488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
470 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2J4
Phone: (905) 878-6500
Fax: (905) 878-6711
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Malec Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Malec ( CPSO# 72488 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
470 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 878-6500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN LESLIE MALEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALEC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000