Maley, Garnet James Michael (CPSO#: 51155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 110
470 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2J4
Phone: (905) 878-0539
Fax: (905) 878-0771
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Garnet Maley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maley ( CPSO# 51155 )

Business Address:
110 - 470 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 878-0539

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 16 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 16 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 16, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Garnet James Michael
            Maley in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Maley to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                    DR. GARNET JAMES MICHAEL MALEY
                                             ("Dr. Maley")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                  (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of
                  Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule "A"; and
                  the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".                                          
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Maley, certificate of registration number 51155, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that the College received information from the
                  NMS and initiated an investigation bearing File Number 7215599 (the
                  "Investigation") into whether I failed to maintain the standard of
                  practice of the profession and/or am incompetent in my prescribing of
                  controlled substances, including narcotics.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective immediately upon the signing of this Undertaking.

            (5)   I, Dr. Maley, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                  (i)   the date of the appointment;
                  (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                  (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction, number of
                        tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                  (iv)  the clinical indication;
                  (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or different
                        dose                                                         or
                        frequency than currently prescribed to the patient (Y/N); 
                  (vi)  Dr. Maley's signature;
                  (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable, as set
                        out                                                          
                        below); and
                  (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set out
                        below).
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                  corresponding patient chart.

            (7)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of twelve (12) months on the terms
                        set out below (the "Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of Clinical
                        Supervision set out below will only be reduced upon recommendation
                        of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
            Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")

                  (c)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake to engage in Phase 1 of Clinical
                        Supervision for a minimum of six (6) months on the terms set out
                        below.
                  
                  (d)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Maley, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every month to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                              i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review, or if since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review  there are not 15 patients
                                    listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs , then the charts of all
                                    patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the
                                    Clinical Supervisor's prior review; and
                  
                              ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated
                                    a new prescription for:
                  
                                    1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                                    2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                                    3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                                          Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                                          where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic
                                          Drug and/or Narcotic Preparation,
                                          
                                    or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review
                                    there are not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log
                                    to whom I have initiated a new prescription for
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations or Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs where the patient is also
                                    prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or Narcotic Preparation,
                                    then the charts of all patients listed in the
                                    Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior
                                    review.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every month.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that after a minimum of six (6) months of
                        Phase 1, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in a less
                        highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that supervision be reduced. 
                  
            Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")

                  (h)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Maley, undertake to engage in Phase 2 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of six (6) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (i)   During Phase 2, I, Dr. Maley, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every three months to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                              i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review, or if since the Clinical
                                    Supervisor(s)'s prior review  there are not 15 patients
                                    listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I have prescribed
                                    Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled
                                    Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    and All other Monitored Drugs , then the charts of all
                                    patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the
                                    Clinical Supervisor's prior review; and
                  
                              ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated
                                    a new prescription for:
                  
                                    1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                                    2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                                    3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                                          Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                                          where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic
                                          Drug and/or Narcotic Preparation,
                  
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review there
                              are not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I
                              have initiated a new prescription for Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                              and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                              where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                              Narcotic Preparation, then the charts of all patients listed
                              in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior
                              review.
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every three months.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that after a minimum of six (6) months of
                        Phase 2, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice without
                        supervision, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may recommend to the
                        College that the Clinical Supervision cease.
                  
                  (m)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical
                        Supervision will only cease upon recommendation of the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
                  (n)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at a minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "F";
                        (ii)  Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                        (iii) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (o)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        location approved by the College;
                  
                  (p)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that all charts reviewed shall be
                        independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the
                        educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F" to
                        my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report of the medical inspector, dated April 15, 2017, and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (q)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        reasonable recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including
                        but not limited to, any reasonable recommended practice
                        improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (r)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (s)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (t)   I, Dr. Maley, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (7)(r) and/or (s)
                        above, I will cease prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances and All other Monitored Drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (u)   I, Dr. Maley, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                        Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs as a result of section (7)(t) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   In the course of this investigation, I, Dr. Maley, voluntarily
                        enrolled in the University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program
                        in Safe Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                        workshop): 
                         www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Schedule "F",
                        including but not limited to, the following elements of
                        professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safe
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                  
                        (ii)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                  
                        1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                              http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
                  
                        2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer
                              Pain: http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html;
                  
                        3.    Preventing the misuse of opioids
                              https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids;
                              and
                  
                        4.    Effective Practice Management of Chronic Non-Cancer Pain Tool
                              https://thewellhealth.ca/cncp
                  
                              (iii) Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                                    CPSO Policy "Medical Records":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Medical-
                                    Records; and 
                  
                              (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                                    Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                        specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                        participant assessment reports where available, within one (1)
                        month of completion of each element. I acknowledge that the College
                        will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed each element of the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake that, approximately six (6) months  after
                        the Clinical Supervision set out under section 7 of the Undertaking
                        has ceased, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Reassessment").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, an interview
                        of me, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

                  (c)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the terms of this Undertaking 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and that the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                        (10) business days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maley, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Maley, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and Schedule "H",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Maley, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with the section above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College received information from the Narcotics
                              Monitoring System about Dr. Maley's prescribing of controlled
                              substances, including narcotics.
                  
                              Based on the information received, the College conducted an
                              investigation into whether Dr. Maley failed to maintain the
                              standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent
                              in his prescribing of controlled substances, including
                              narcotics.  As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              "Dr. Maley's prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic
                              preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other
                              targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be
                              supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College
                              for a minimum of twelve (12) months. 
                  
                              "Dr. Maley will engage in professional education in the
                              prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.
                  
                              "Following the professional education and period of
                              supervision, Dr. Maley's prescribing of controlled
                              substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an
                              assessor selected by the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Maley, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Maley, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Maley, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 16, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Garnet James Michael Maley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 16, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Maley’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Maley failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Maley’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of twelve (12) months.

Dr. Maley will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Maley’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.