Malhan, Hafiz Mosa Ali (CPSO#: 107993)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2015 to 23 Nov 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2016