Malhotra, Kenneth Samuel (CPSO#: 70370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Digestive Health Clinic Inc
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone: (905) 683-1700
Fax: (905) 683-2577
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jurt Malhotra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Malhotra ( CPSO# 70370 )
Dr. U. Jurt ( CPSO# 71390 )

Business Address:
Brampton Cardio Pulmonary Clinic
7 - 31 Centre Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2X7
Phone Number: (905) 455-3010

Business Address:
Kingston Heart Clinic
416 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1C2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3242

Business Address:
Digestive Health Clinic Inc.
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 09 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH SAMUEL MALHOTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALHOTRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998