Malhotra, Kuldip Kumar (CPSO#: 52194)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Agra University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone: (519) 744-2691
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. K. Malhotra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Malhotra ( CPSO# 52194 )

Business Address:
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone Number: (519) 744-2691

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KULDIP KUMAR MALHOTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALHOTRA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1984