Malhotra, Rohin Tilak (CPSO#: 79723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L8M 0L8
Phone: 9058452571
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROHIN TILAK MALHOTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALHOTRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008