Malick, Arfa Khatoon (CPSO#: 57748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Filipino, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Patna University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
597 Parliament Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W3
Phone: (416) 515-1333
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARFA KHATOON MALICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 01 Oct 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 11 Oct 1988 to 31 Jan 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1989