Malik, Abdul (CPSO#: 77751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu

Education:University of Sind, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
James Potter Rd Medical Centre
9715 James Potter Road
Unit # 102-103
Brampton ON  L6X 3B9
Phone: (905) 457-5800
Fax: (905) 457-5080
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdul Malik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malik ( CPSO# 77751 )

Business Address:
James Potter Road Medical Centre
Suite 102
9715 James Potter Road
Brampton ON  L6X 3B9
Phone Number: (905) 457-5800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Sep 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDUL MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2003 to 03 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2012