Malik, Anupam (CPSO#: 52182)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 136
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Phone: (905) 451-1244 Ext. 101
Fax: (905) 451-6955
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANUPAM MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Sep 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1990