Malik, Arinder Kaur (CPSO#: 73716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjab University India, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 12 suite 100A
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (289) 337-2716
Fax: (289) 337-8396
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Paediatrics
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
North Shore Road
Burlington ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arinder Malik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malik ( CPSO# 73716 )

Business Address:
100A - 3305 Harvester Road
Unit 12
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (289) 337-2716

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARINDER KAUR MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal Cardiology

McMaster University, 27 Oct 2003 to 26 Apr 2004
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Jun 2009