Malik, Azhar Mahmood (CPSO#: 57290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:University of Cairo, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 456-1256
Fax: (905) 456-9411
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2 Townline
Orangeville ON  L9W 3T6
Canada
Phone: (519) 940-0134
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Azhar Malik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malik ( CPSO# 57290 )

Business Address:
Suite 500
18 Kenginston Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (905) 456-1256

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZHAR MAHMOOD MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1989