Malik, Khalid Saeed (CPSO#: 91757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 HOSPITAL DRIVE
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: 7057432121 Ext. 3084
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

580 Hardwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khalid Malik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Malik ( CPSO# 91757 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Apr 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 May 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 May 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Khalid Saaed Malik may practice medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.