Malik, Mahmood Hassan (CPSO#: 30957)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2001