Malik, Nariman (CPSO#: 76449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
Department of Anesthesia
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2561
Fax: (416) 495-2879
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nariman Malik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Malik ( CPSO# 76449 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
Department of Anesthesia
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2561

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Aug 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NARIMAN MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2007