Malik, Paul Guneet (CPSO#: 70790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardiovascular Lab, Kidd 3
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-1329
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Malik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Malik ( CPSO# 70790 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Cardiovascular Laboratory - Kidd 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-1329

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital - Brock 1 Clinic
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 13 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL GUNEET MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 1996 to 22 Sep 1996
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2001