Malik, Saleem Tahir Ahmad (CPSO#: 64741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Cambridge, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
1139 Alloy Drive
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6M8
Phone: (807) 345-1170
Fax: (807) 768-1580
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saleem Malik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Malik ( CPSO# 64741 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
1139 Alloy Drive
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6M8
Phone Number: (807) 345-1170

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALEEM TAHIR AHMAD MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1995