Malik, Uzma (CPSO#: 63053)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Aga Khan University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 27 May 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 28 Feb 1994
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 28 Feb 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1995 to 24 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999