Malik, Vinod (CPSO#: 42441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400A-2555 St. Joseph Blvd
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone: (613) 834-8913
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vinod Malik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Malik ( CPSO# 42441 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 1S6
Phone Number: (613) 834-8913

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINOD MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991