Malkin, David Daniel (CPSO#: 54510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7753
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID DANIEL MALKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALKIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Clinical Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1985