Mallette-Edwards, Shelley Anne (CPSO#: 63717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1077 North Service Road
Unit 27
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1A6
Phone: (905) 949-1700
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

170 Queensway West
Mississauga,Ontario
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Canada
Phone: (905) 275-3912
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1Z4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shelley Mallette-Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mallette-Edwards ( CPSO# 63717 )

Business Address:
Unit 27
1077 North Service Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1A6
Phone Number: (905) 949-1700

Business Address:
170 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone Number: (905) 275-3912

Business Address:
2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1Z4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELLEY ANNE MALLETTE-EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALLETTE-EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1992